+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 10/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 590.
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- House conferees appointed: Carmody, Adams, and Broadwater.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, Morrell, and Martiny.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 678, ADOPT (#1348)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
June 6, 2016: House Vote on HB 678, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1338)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
June 5, 2016: House Vote on HB 678, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1316)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 31, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 678, FINAL PASSAGE (#1159)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
April 19, 2016: House Vote on HB 678, FINAL PASSAGE (#385)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor