+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 460.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/15/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2018: House Vote on HB 678, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1123)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
May 7, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 678, FINAL PASSAGE (#770)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
March 15, 2018: House Vote on HB 678, FINAL PASSAGE (#28)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor