+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 168.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/18/2013.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 356 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (15-0).
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 674, FINAL PASSAGE (#580)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2013: House Vote on HB 674, FINAL PASSAGE (#70)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor