+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: January 1, 2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 349.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 670, FINAL PASSAGE (#779)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2015: House Vote on HB 670, FINAL PASSAGE (#426)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor