+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 252.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 654, CO-AUTHORS (#1112)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 13
May 19, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 654, FINAL PASSAGE (#1113)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2014: House Vote on HB 654, FINAL PASSAGE (#569)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor