+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Notice removed
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (19-0).
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor