+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-1).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 20, 2015: House Vote on HB 648, FINAL PASSAGE (#431)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor