+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 811.
- Effective date: June 23, 2014.
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/14.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2014.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Peterson, and Morrell.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- House conferees appointed: Leger, Simon, and Moreno.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/27/2014.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (6)
June 2, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 63, ADOPT (#1721)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 63, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1574)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 63, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#821)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
April 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 63, CO-AUTHORS (#601)
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 18
April 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 63, FINAL PASSAGE (#602)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
March 31, 2014: House Vote on HB 63, FINAL PASSAGE (#134)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor