+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-6-1).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor