+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 123.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 62, nays 39. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Donahue, and Riser.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Jackson, Robideaux, and Kleckley.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/07/2015.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (6-5).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 11, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 624, ADOPT (#1116)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
June 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 624, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1112)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 4
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 624, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#969)
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 19
June 6, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 624, FINAL PASSAGE (#870)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 624, FINAL PASSAGE (#258)
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor