+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188.
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2014.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 620, FINAL PASSAGE (#862)
- Yeas: 39
March 25, 2014: House Vote on HB 620, FINAL PASSAGE (#82)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor