+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Becomes Act No. 471.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without amendments (10-0-1).
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (17-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 618, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#968)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
June 5, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 618, FINAL PASSAGE (#808)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 13, 2015: House Vote on HB 618, FINAL PASSAGE (#332)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
May 13, 2015: House Vote on HB 618, FINAL PASSAGE (#332)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor