+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 229.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (17-0).
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 617, FINAL PASSAGE (#726)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
May 9, 2017: House Vote on HB 617, FINAL PASSAGE (#241)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor