+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 47. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
- Notice given.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-4).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 19, 2021: House Vote on HB 615, FINAL PASSAGE (#581)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor