+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 3, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 70.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/17.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 615, FINAL PASSAGE (#443)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
April 27, 2017: House Vote on HB 615, FINAL PASSAGE (#86)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor