+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2019: House Vote on HB 610, FINAL PASSAGE (#324)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 17
May 15, 2019: House Vote on HB 610, OBJECTION (#325)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor