+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Boudreaux, and Cortez.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Hoffmann, Pearson, and Miguez.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/29/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 61, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1235)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
June 1, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 61, FINAL PASSAGE (#1208)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 25, 2016: House Vote on HB 61, FINAL PASSAGE (#437)
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor