+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 60. Failed to pass.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2016: House Vote on HB 598, FINAL PASSAGE (#508)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor