+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2019.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 366.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 7 nays.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Allain, and Carter.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Abramson, and DeVillier.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 596, ADOPT (#1022)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 8
June 6, 2019: House Vote on HB 596, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1035)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 21
June 4, 2019: House Vote on HB 596, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#965)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
June 3, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 596, FINAL PASSAGE (#881)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2019: House Vote on HB 596, FINAL PASSAGE (#407)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor