+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/22/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 356.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2017: House Vote on HB 596, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#847)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 596, FINAL PASSAGE (#725)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
May 8, 2017: House Vote on HB 596, FINAL PASSAGE (#190)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor