+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Rules suspended. Recalled from final passage.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
- Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Vote
May 29, 2019: House Vote on HB 595, FINAL PASSAGE (#650)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor