+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 183.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 59, FINAL PASSAGE (#516)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
May 1, 2013: House Vote on HB 59, FINAL PASSAGE (#221)
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor