+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2016.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 588, FINAL PASSAGE (#391)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 12, 2016: House Vote on HB 588, FINAL PASSAGE (#280)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor