+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 343.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 13. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
- Notice given.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 26. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 579, FINAL PASSAGE (#772)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
May 19, 2015: House Vote on HB 579, FINAL PASSAGE (#412)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 11
May 6, 2015: House Vote on HB 579, FINAL PASSAGE (#228)
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 12
May 6, 2015: House Vote on HB 579, FINAL PASSAGE (#228)
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor