+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (18-0).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 575, FINAL PASSAGE (#534)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
May 22, 2020: House Vote on HB 575, FINAL PASSAGE (#339)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor