+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: 5/26/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 18.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2015.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (18-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 572, FINAL PASSAGE (#398)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 21, 2015: House Vote on HB 572, FINAL PASSAGE (#26)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor