+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: June 30, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 371.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/27/2015.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 56, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
June 4, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 56, FINAL PASSAGE (#750)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2015: House Vote on HB 56, FINAL PASSAGE (#110)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor