+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/16/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2021: House Vote on HB 558, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#918)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
May 25, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 558, FINAL PASSAGE (#481)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
May 3, 2021: House Vote on HB 558, FINAL PASSAGE (#167)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6