+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 629.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0-1).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2016: House Vote on HB 556, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1133)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
May 23, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#924)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 19, 2016: House Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#378)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor