+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 325.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (7-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 552, FINAL PASSAGE (#944)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 12, 2018: House Vote on HB 552, FINAL PASSAGE (#405)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor