+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 22, 2013: House Vote on HB 55, FINAL PASSAGE (#541)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor