+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: July 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 120.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2015.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-4).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (5)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 549, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#962)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
June 6, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#879)
- Yeas: 39
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#244)
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#244)
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#244)
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor