+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-6).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor