+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor