+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 9.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2016: House Vote on HB 516, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#460)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
April 19, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 516, FINAL PASSAGE (#328)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
April 4, 2016: House Vote on HB 516, FINAL PASSAGE (#135)
- Yeas: 102
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor