+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor