+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 05/23/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 435.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18.
- Notice given.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/18.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2018: House Vote on HB 514, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1068)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
April 25, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 514, FINAL PASSAGE (#545)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
March 27, 2018: House Vote on HB 514, FINAL PASSAGE (#146)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor