+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Veto message received and read.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0).
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 505, FINAL PASSAGE (#688)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
May 11, 2017: House Vote on HB 505, FINAL PASSAGE (#280)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 11