+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/28/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 64, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 17 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/13/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 23, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 50, AMENDMENT # 229 BY ALLAIN, HB 50 BY MONTOUCET (#76)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
June 23, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 50, FINAL PASSAGE (#77)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 17
June 23, 2016: House Vote on HB 50, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#51)
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 14
June 23, 2016: House Vote on HB 50, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#51)
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 14
June 13, 2016: House Vote on HB 50, FINAL PASSAGE (#18)
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 3