+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On September 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On September 25, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
October 2, 2020: House Vote on HB 5, FINAL PASSAGE (#13)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor