+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Becomes HB 1164.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported by substitute (10-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor