+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 22, 2017: House Vote on HB 496, FINAL PASSAGE (#399)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor