+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 553.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 493, FINAL PASSAGE (#1236)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2018: House Vote on HB 493, FINAL PASSAGE (#594)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor