+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-0).
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
May 5, 2014: House Vote on HB 490, FINAL PASSAGE (#721)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor