+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 05/30/19.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 32.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 49, FINAL PASSAGE (#433)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2019: House Vote on HB 49, FINAL PASSAGE (#158)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor