+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 01/01/18.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/15/2017.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 476, FINAL PASSAGE (#291)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 7
May 11, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 476, CO-AUTHORS (#292)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 18
April 25, 2017: House Vote on HB 476, FINAL PASSAGE (#46)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor