+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/22/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
On June 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (17-0).
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#39)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
June 9, 2016: House Vote on HB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#15)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor