+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 421.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2017: House Vote on HB 461, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#811)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 461, FINAL PASSAGE (#687)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 5
May 23, 2017: House Vote on HB 461, FINAL PASSAGE (#401)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor