+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 05/16/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 68.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 456, FINAL PASSAGE (#625)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 456, FINAL PASSAGE (#186)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor