+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0-1).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 4, 2017: House Vote on HB 455, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#702)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
May 30, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 455, FINAL PASSAGE (#540)
- Yeas: 38
May 8, 2017: House Vote on HB 455, FINAL PASSAGE (#181)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor